+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 512815/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
512815/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2018: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 5, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2018: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 14, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor