+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (110-27)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
- Special Order until next session (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 349530/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (96-35)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment 923928/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (44-89)
- Floor Amendment 633320/1 (Delegate Cardin) Rejected (38-90)
- Special Order until later this session (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 625762/1 Report Adopted
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (6)
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 27
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
March 14, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 12, 2019: House Floor - Floor Amendment {633320/1 (Delegate Cardin) Rejected
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 90
March 12, 2019: House Floor - Floor Amendment {923928/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 89
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor