+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (133-1)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
- Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) {433226/1 Adopted
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {768077/1 Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {763123/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {322612/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-506 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 1
March 26, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments
- Yeas: 47
March 13, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor