+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-1)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) {243423/1 Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {305367/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-413 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor