+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 - Article - III - Legislative Department
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor