+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Vote
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor