+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {746083/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
746083/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-117 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor