+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {606382/1 Report Adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
606382/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-302 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (4)
March 25, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 16, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor