+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-5)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {640011/1 Report Adopted
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
640011/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 14, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 13, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor