+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - State Lottery - Sales of Lottery Tickets and Tickets From Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Commissions
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Recede
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {523721/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-1)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - State Lottery - Sales of Lottery Tickets and Tickets From Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Commissions
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {333823/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - State Lottery - Sales of Lottery Tickets and Tickets From Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Commissions
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-112, 9-117, 9-120, 9-913 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 18, 2022: Third Reading Passed (130-1)
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 1
March 17, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 11, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor