+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – First–Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – First–Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {525169/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – First–Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-208 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Yeas: 135
March 20, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 9, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor