+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-203 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 23, 2013: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 21, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor