+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-2)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (124-15)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {116886/1 Report Adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
116886/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-302 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
February 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 15
February 16, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor