+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-2)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 6, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor