+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-4)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 20-608 - Article - Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 11, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 4
March 7, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor