+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {977471/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {303493/2 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 28, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 12, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor