+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-0)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 9, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 125
March 6, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor