+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 610818/1 Report Adopted
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
610818/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-110 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 29, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 22, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor