+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {296887/1 Report Adopted
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
296887/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 15, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor