+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Department of Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery Regulations - Clarification
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Department of Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery Regulations - Clarification
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Department of Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery Regulations - Clarification
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-904 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 16, 2022: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
February 14, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor