+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 766
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (36-0)
- Special Order until 9:30 pm (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {526685/1 Report Adopted
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
526685/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 36
March 17, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 17, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor