+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 783
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (87-48)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-11)
- Floor Amendment {703420/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-29)
- Floor Amendment {163726/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-31)
- Floor Amendment {203721/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-31)
- Floor Amendment {453326/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32)
- Floor Amendment {853327/2 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)
- Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {103820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30)
- Floor Amendment {973429/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {787777/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {373620/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-30)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (91-48)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {793129/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (49-87)
- Floor Amendment {133725/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-86)
- Floor Amendment {313623/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-85)
- Floor Amendment {963223/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (50-86)
- Favorable with Amendments {584568/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (16)
April 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 5, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 48
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 11
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {163726/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 31
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {203721/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 31
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {453326/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 32
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {703420/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 29
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {853327/2 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 28
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {103820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 30
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {973429/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 31
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {373620/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 30
March 18, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {963223/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 86
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {313623/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 85
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {133725/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 86
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {793129/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 87
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor