+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Referred Finance
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-2)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {663490/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-1201, 8-1202, 8-1202.1, 8-1204 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 11, 2021: Third Reading Passed (137-2)
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 2
March 10, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
February 8, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor