+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 554138/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 664066/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 24-301 through 24-309 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
April 4, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
March 15, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Southern Maryland Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor