+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Finance
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-49)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment {133597/1 Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {793892/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 16, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 49
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor