+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {965266/1 Report Adopted
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
965266/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1A-27 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137