+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-3)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-1)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 235862/1 Report Adopted
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
235862/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1C-01 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
- Nays: 1
March 11, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor