+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {935862/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
935862/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2015: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 20, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139