+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (42-0)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 516883/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
516883/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 42
March 17, 2018: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 14, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor