+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (88-49)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {872318/1 Report Adopted
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
872318/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 27-101 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2015: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 19, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 49
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor