+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Special Order until next session (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {320418/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendment
320418/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-621 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 26, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 13, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor