+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-6)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {573623/1 (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2021: Third Reading Passed (130-6)
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 6
February 10, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor