+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (141-0)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments 640816/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
640816/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 141
February 18, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor