+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-11)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {363590/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
363590/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 28, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 14, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 13, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor