+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (92-46)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29)
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments {507779/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (92-43)
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523720/1 Withdrawn
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {653295/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 46
April 7, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 6, 2016: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {343522/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 29
April 6, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 14
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor