+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (92-41)
- Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {973620/1 Adopted
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-301, 1-302.1, 1-304.2, 1-305, 1-306, 1-307, 1-309.1, 1-310, 1-311 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (92-41)
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 41
February 14, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor