+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (37-8)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (116-20)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {676081/1 Report Adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On July 14, 2015 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
676081/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-810 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 8
February 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 20
February 16, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor