+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On July 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-516 - Article - Correctional Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor