+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Veto Letter
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (117-12)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division - Compensation
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division - Compensation
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-122 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 18, 2022: Third Reading Passed (117-12)
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 12
March 17, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 18, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor