+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn by Sponsor
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing canceled
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Prince George’s County Board of Education – Membership – Alterations PG 506–22
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-1002, 3-1003, 3-1004, 3-114 - Article - Education
+ − Vote
March 3, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor