+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-15)
- Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Floor Amendment {713928/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-31)
- Floor Amendment {423027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31)
- Floor Amendment {663825/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-31)
- Floor Amendment {263322/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-32)
- Floor Amendment {833927/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-30)
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable
- Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Hough) Adopted
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-51)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {683224/1 (Delegate Simonaire) Rejected (47-89)
- Favorable with Amendments {856381/1 Report Adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 24, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {713928/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 31
March 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {663825/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 31
March 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {833927/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 30
March 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {263322/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 32
March 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {423027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 31
March 13, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 13, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 51
March 11, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {683224/1 (Delegate Simonaire) Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 89
March 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 32
March 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 15
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor