+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {313890/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
313890/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor