+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {730116/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendment
730116/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 25-401 - Article - Public Utilities
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 13, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor