+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {204637/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
204637/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-505 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 131
April 2, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 7, 2013: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor