+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 4/08 at 3:45 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-0)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {215562/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
215562/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-1008 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
April 5, 2013: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 1, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 128
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor