+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 14-126 - Article - Real Property
- 14-126.1 - Article - Real Property
- 14-126.2 - Article - Real Property
- 14-126.3 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.1 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.10 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.11 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.12 through 7-105.14 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.12 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.14 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.2 through 7-105.11 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.2 - Article - Real Property
- 7-105.5 - Article - Real Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 14, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
February 11, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor