+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable with Amendments {485960/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
485960/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-701 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 4, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 19, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor