+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (109-29)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 29
February 16, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor