+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (36-10)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-41)
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable with Amendments 410614/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
410614/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 10
March 16, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 14, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 41