+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 24-113.2 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 30, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 9, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor